open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:17-10833
    Party Name:Santayan C. Warren
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Response With No Opposition]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Payroll Deduction (Amended)]
    Date Published:October 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Held-Plan Confirmable AEC]
    Date Published:October 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Installment Payment/Filing Fee Paid in Full]
    Date Published:September 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Installment Payment]
    Date Published:September 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Court's Notice of Deficient Filings]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Default on Motion (Dismiss)]
    Date Published:June 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Held-Motion to Dismiss-CD]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Compensation]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Held - Trustee's Motion to Dismiss - WD]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Continued without follow-up]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Payroll Deduction]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Trustee)]
    Date Published:January 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:September 03, 2014
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?323574
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =