open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-50307
    Party Name:Ralph Bentley
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:June 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:June 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:February 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?340051
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =