open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:13-50788
    Party Name:Carla R. Wilkerson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:October 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Notice of Deconsolidation]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Final Installment Payment/Filing Fee Paid in Full]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?340648
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =