open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-40455
    Party Name:Carolyn Louise Patterson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Notice to File Form 423 - Final Notice Ch 7 Only]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Payroll Deduction]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?342439
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =