open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-40358
    Party Name:Christy R. Davis
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:November 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:October 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Notice of Certification of Plan Completion and Request for Discharge]
    Date Published:September 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Notice to Debtor Regarding Certification of Plan Completion (FINAL NOTICE)]
    Date Published:September 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Notice to Debtor Regarding Certification of Plan Completion (1st NOTICE)]
    Date Published:August 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Payroll Deduction]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?341803
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =