open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-40034
    Party Name:Patrick P. Price and Sheila A. Price
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:September 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Hearing Not Held]
    Date Published:August 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Notice to File Form 423 - Final Notice Ch 7 Only]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:July 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Avoid Lien]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Avoid Lien for Non-PMSI Pursuant to 522(f)(1)(B)]
    Date Published:June 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, Walter W [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Modify Plan After Confirmation]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?339437
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =