open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:13-52871
    Party Name:Kimberly Chambliss
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:June 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:June 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Notice of Certification of Plan Completion and Request for Discharge]
    Date Published:May 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Notice to Debtor Regarding Certification of Plan Completion (FINAL NOTICE)]
    Date Published:April 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Notice to Debtor Regarding Certification of Plan Completion (1st NOTICE)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismiss Case (Other) (batch)(Trustee)]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Held-Motion to Dismiss-CD]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Continued without follow-up]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Payroll Deduction]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Trustee)]
    Date Published:September 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Suspend Plan Payments]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?337301
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =