open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-70297
    Party Name:Leslie Howard
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:July 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Default on Motion (Dismiss)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Held-Motion to Dismiss-CD]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Payroll Deduction]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Continued Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:December 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Continued without follow-up]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Trustee)]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Installment Payment/Filing Fee Paid in Full]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?340830
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =