open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:12-30537
    Party Name:Deidra L. Bulger
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Notice of Certification of Plan Completion and Request for Discharge]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Notice to Debtor Regarding Certification of Plan Completion (FINAL NOTICE)]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?320739
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =