open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-30330
    Party Name:Willie Roger Callaway and Mary E Callaway
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:February 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Notice of Certification of Plan Completion and Request for Discharge]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Held-Motion to Dismiss-CD]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Trustee)]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Not Held]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismiss Case (Other) (batch)(Trustee)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?341469
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =