open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:19-30516
    Party Name:Robert Darryl Culp
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Show Cause for Dismissal of Case]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Letter Regarding Fees Due]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Court's Notice of Deficient Filings]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:January 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismiss Case (Other) (batch)(Trustee)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?341461
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =