open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:20-30235
    Party Name:Jonathan Ray Sims
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:June 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismissing Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Held and Continued to Final Disposition Calendar]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:November 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Held-Motion to Dismiss-CD]
    Date Published:November 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Held-Plan Confirmed (Terminate Hearings)]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Continued without follow-up]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismiss Case (Other) (batch)(Trustee)]
    Date Published:December 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Avoid Lien]
    Date Published:December 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Trustee)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?341369
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =