open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:12-55167-wlh
    Party Name:Lisa M Shackelford
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scarver, Cathy L. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Discharging Debtor and Closing Estate (182)]
    Date Published:April 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scarver, Cathy L. [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Discharged]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scarver, Cathy L. [01-Order Discharging Ch. 7 Debtor and Closing Estate]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scarver, Cathy L. [Autodocket of Installment Receipt - Intake]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scarver, Cathy L. [Notice to Deposit Unclaimed Funds]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Scarver, Cathy L. [Order re: request for 521 dismissal]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [07-First Request to Conv. From 13 to 7 Granted]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (FOR OTHER)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Substitute Attorney, Motion to]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?911468
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =