open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-42344-pwb
    Party Name:Jerry Lamar Blaylock, Jr. and Kristi Melaine Blaylock
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:June 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Trustees (12/13) Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:June 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [07-Order Dismissing Ch. 13 Case - MTD Hearing Held/Funding]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [05-Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Extend Stay, Motion to]
    Date Published:September 22, 2014
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:September 20, 2014
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order Closing 13 Dismissed]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?991633
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =