open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-56234-lrc
    Party Name:Grenville E Alert
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:April 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Discharged]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Order Closing 7 Asset Case]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [U.S. Trustee's Final Account/Certification]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Order on Final Report and Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:December 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Trustees Final Report and Application for Fees]
    Date Published:October 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Request for Special Charges]
    Date Published:June 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Abandonment (556)]
    Date Published:May 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Notice of Abandonment of Property]
    Date Published:May 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [0-Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:May 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Update Claim Status]
    Date Published:May 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Withdrawal of Claim]
    Date Published:May 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Objection to Claim (Motion to Disallow Claim)]
    Date Published:May 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C [05-Trustees Interim Report]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice Fixing Claim Deadline]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Notice Setting Deadline to File Proofs of Claim]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Chapter 7 Trustees Report of Assets and Request to Set Claim Deadline]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order to Approve Settlement Agreement]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Motion to Approve Settlement]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Approve Settlement, Motion to]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [05-Trustees Interim Report]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Notice of Case Reassignment]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [07-Application to Employ]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?996747
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =