open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:15-42204-mgd
    Party Name:Jerry Lamar Williams, Jr. and Billie Gaye Williams
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order Closing 13 Dismissed]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Trustees (12/13) Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [07-Order Dismissing Ch. 13 Case - MTD Hearing Held/Funding]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Sever, Motion to (FEE)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:July 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case (403)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Dismiss for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Motion to]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certification Re: Review of Proof of Claims]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Confirmation of Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Trustees Supplemental Report Requesting Confirmation]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Re: Financial Mgmt. Cert.]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice to Debtor Regarding Financial Management Certificate Due]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Amended Plan]
    Date Published:December 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Schedule C]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Schedule B]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [02-Chapter 13 - Pre-Confirmation Plan Amendment]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Affidavit]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [04-Payment of FINAL Installment Re: Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Filing Fee]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Deficiency - Filing Fee (60 day)]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [0-Change of Address (document requesting)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Filing Fee Deficiency]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [03-Payment of Chapter 13 Installment Fee]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Deficiency - Filing Fee (30 day)]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Extend Stay, Motion to]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:September 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
    Date Published:September 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B21) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:September 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:September 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:September 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:September 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [02-Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1001101
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =