open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-56248-crm
    Party Name:Gregory Dante Flythe
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:December 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - Ad Hoc Minimal Funds]
    Date Published:October 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Disburse]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C [Disburse Funds, Motion to]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Abandonment (556)]
    Date Published:July 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C [Notice of Abandonment of Property]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C [05-Trustees Interim Report]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Relief from Stay (401)]
    Date Published:December 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Relief from Stay, Motion for]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [00-Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [05-Trustees Interim Report]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [07-Application to Employ]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?996771
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =