open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:19-40357-pwb
    Party Name:Samuel Murphy Bray and Catherine Johnson Bray
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice (BK)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Transfer of Claim (FEE)]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Mortgage Forbearance Under the CARES Act]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Relief from Stay, Motion for]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice to Debtor Re: Domestic Support Obligations]
    Date Published:June 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Confirmation of Ch. 13 Plan - New Plan Form (12/1/17 or after)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Confirmation Hearing Rescheduled]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice to Debtor Regarding Financial Management Certificate Due]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Hearing on Confirmation of Modified Plan and of Deadlines for Objections]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Proceedings Memorandum]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [0-Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [02-Chapter 13 - Pre-Confirmation Plan Modification or Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Schedule C]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Declaration of Debtor]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Retain Funds, Motion to]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [04-Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Miscellaneous Deficiencies]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Manner of Service Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004]
    Date Published:February 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [02-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 13) and Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Discharging Debtor.]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Reopen Case, Motion to]
    Date Published:August 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certification of Financial Management Course for Debtor]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order Closing Case Without Discharge (Ch. 13)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [06-Close Bankruptcy Case Without Discharge - Fin. Mgmt.]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Reconsider Order of Dismissal, Motion to]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?857870
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =