open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:18-10103-whd
    Party Name:William Jennings Harris and Cynthia Dale Harris
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certification Re: Review of Proof of Claims]
    Date Published:April 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Re: Financial Mgmt. Cert.]
    Date Published:April 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice to Debtor Regarding Financial Management Certificate Due]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice to Debtor Re: Domestic Support Obligations]
    Date Published:April 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [09-Motion for Leave of Absence]
    Date Published:March 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:March 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [P-Declaration of Debtor]
    Date Published:March 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [P-Amendment to Schedules D, E, F and/or E/F (FEE)]
    Date Published:March 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:March 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:January 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:January 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [02-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 13) and Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:January 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:January 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:January 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
    Date Published:January 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:January 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Discharge of Ch. 13 Debtor.]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?857704
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =