open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:17-56080-sms
    Party Name:Stacy Butler
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Dismissing Case.]
    Date Published:September 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [06-Order Dismissing Ch. 13 Case - Failure to Comply]
    Date Published:September 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case (403)]
    Date Published:June 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Relief from Stay (401)]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Relief from Stay, Motion for]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice to Debtor Re: Domestic Support Obligations]
    Date Published:September 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Confirmation of Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Objecting to Discharge]
    Date Published:September 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order on Motion Objecting to Discharge]
    Date Published:September 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [00-Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Amended Plan]
    Date Published:August 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [0-Change of Address (document requesting)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Re: Financial Mgmt. Cert.]
    Date Published:June 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice to Debtor Regarding Financial Management Certificate Due]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice Rescheduling Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice Rescheduling Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Ch. 13 Meeting of Creditors Not Held]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:April 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Chapter 13 Monthly Income Statement/Calculation of Disposable Income Document(s) - (122C-1/122C-2)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Declaration of Debtor]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Attorney Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Schedule J]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Schedule I]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Schedule H]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Schedule G]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Schedule C]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Individual]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition, All Schedules & Statements (Fee)-case upload]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition, All Schedules & Statements (Fee)-case upload]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed]
    Date Published:November 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order Closing 13 Dismissed]
    Date Published:November 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Trustees (12/13) Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Dismissing Case (155)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [03-Order Dismissing Ch. 13 Case - Conf. Denied Failure to Fund Plan]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Autodocket of Installment Receipt - Intake]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Confirming No Stay in Effect]
    Date Published:September 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order confirming no stay is in effect, motion to]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Objecting to Discharge, Motion]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:September 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Exhibits]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Filing Fee Deficiency]
    Date Published:September 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:September 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order Confirming No Stay Is In Effect, Motion for]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Deficiency - Filing Fee (30 day)]
    Date Published:September 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Granting Application to Pay Filing Fees]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [02g-Order Granting Application (Paid in Installments)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [02-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [02-Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [02-Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, Martha A. [Redeem with Notice to Respond, Motion to]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?991198
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =