open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-65313-lrc
    Party Name:Joseph Dieufait Laime
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Order Closing 13 Discharged]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Discharged]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Trustee's (12/13) Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Discharging Debtor.]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Discharge of Ch. 13 Debtor]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Debtor's 11 U.S.C. Section 1328 Certificate]
    Date Published:February 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice of Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Transfer of Claim (FEE)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:June 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Relief from Stay (401)]
    Date Published:May 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Relief from Stay, Motion for]
    Date Published:May 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:April 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [00-Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE)]
    Date Published:April 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case (403)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [P-Declaration of Debtor]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [P-Schedule J]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [P-Schedule I]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Joint Interim Statement for Transferred Case]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (FOR OTHER)]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Relief from Stay (401)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay, Motion for]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Case Reassignment]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:August 07, 2014
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [00-Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?992028
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =