open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:13-43033-mgd
    Party Name:Zulekha Michele Neal
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order Closing 13 Dismissed]
    Date Published:February 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed]
    Date Published:February 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Trustees (12/13) Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [04-Trustees Supplemental Report Requesting Dismissal]
    Date Published:January 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Reconsider Order of Dismissal, Motion to]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Dismissing Case.]
    Date Published:April 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [06-Order Dismissing Ch. 13 Case - Failure to Comply]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [04-Trustees Supplemental Report Requesting Dismissal for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Suspend/Extend Plan Payments, Motion to]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Motion to Approve Settlement]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Objection]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Schedule C]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [P-Schedule B]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Disburse Funds, Motion to]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Approve Settlement, Motion to]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [0-Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [0-Change of Address (document requesting)]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [05-Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?981282
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =