open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:15-62607-mgd
    Party Name:Eddie L. Webb
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order Closing 13 Dismissed]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Dismissing Case with Prejudice]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B21) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [06-Order Dismissing Case (Debtor Ineligible Only in Ch. 13)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?994207
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =