open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-53342-jwc
    Party Name:Ralph Ellis Jackson and Annie R Jackson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Order Closing 7 Asset Case]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Discharged]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [U.S. Trustee's Final Account/Certification]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application for Compensation (409)]
    Date Published:March 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Order on Final Report and Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Trustees Final Report and Application for Fees]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Abandonment (556)]
    Date Published:September 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Request for Special Charges]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Notice of Abandonment of Property]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C [05-Trustees Interim Report]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Employ (408)]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Application to Employ]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [05-Trustees Interim Report]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [07-Application to Employ]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?992730
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =