open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:16-55577-wlh
    Party Name:LaVerne Laurel Anthony
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:July 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed]
    Date Published:July 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Order Closing 13 Dismissed]
    Date Published:July 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Trustees (12/13) Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Dismissing Case (155)]
    Date Published:June 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [03-Order Dismissing Ch. 13 Case - Conf. Denied Failure to Fund Plan]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Debtor(s) Questionnaire]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Granting Application to Pay Filing Fees]
    Date Published:April 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [04-Payment of FINAL Installment Re: Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Filing Fee]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [02g-Order Granting Application (Paid in Installments)]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [02-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [02-Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [06-Order Dismissing Ch. 13 Case - Failure to Comply]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?990596
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =