open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-40209-mgd
    Party Name:Jermile A. Evans and Darlene E. Evans
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Discharge not applicable]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order Closing Estate - Debtor Ineligible for Discharge (Ch. 7/13)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Trustees (12/13) Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Debtor's 11 U.S.C. Section 1328 Certificate]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Plan Completion Re: 522(q) May NOT Apply]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:September 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:August 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Retain Funds, Motion to]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order on Motion Objecting to Discharge]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?991048
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =