open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:13-42114-mgd
    Party Name:Michael Shane Brannon and Sandy Richelle Brannon
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montz, Tracey L. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Discharging Debtor and Closing Estate (182)]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montz, Tracey L. [01-Order Discharging Ch. 7 Debtor and Closing Estate]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montz, Tracey L. [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Discharged]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montz, Tracey L. [Order re: request for 521 dismissal]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montz, Tracey L. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montz, Tracey L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montz, Tracey L. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:October 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montz, Tracey L. [Meeting of Creditors Reset - Ch. 7]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [07-First Request to Conv. From 13 to 7 Granted]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Disallow Claim (Objection to Claim), Motion to]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?971906
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =