open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:12-67154-bem
    Party Name:Giorgio Medici
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:July 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [U.S. Trustees Final Account/Certification]
    Date Published:July 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application for Compensation (409)]
    Date Published:May 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [Order on Final Report and Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [0-Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [Trustees Final Report and Application for Fees]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (489)]
    Date Published:January 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [Withdraw as Attorney, Motion to]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [Notice]
    Date Published:December 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order to Disallow Claim]
    Date Published:October 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [Disallow Claim (Objection to Claim), Motion to]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [Objection to Claim (Motion to Disallow Claim)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [Adversary Closed]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order to Approve Settlement Agreement]
    Date Published:June 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [Motion to Approve Settlement]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [0-Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [Approve Settlement, Motion to]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [05-Trustees Interim Report]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [Notice of Leave of Absence]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kerr, Jeffrey K. [Examination, Motion for]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?928273
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =