open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:16-70032-pmb
    Party Name:Horace Mcday
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Trustees (12/13) Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:September 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application for Compensation (409)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Dismissing Case.]
    Date Published:June 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [05-Motion to Dismiss Case (FOR OTHER)]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Hearing]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Amended Plan]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Confirmation Hearing Rescheduled]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [P-Schedule J]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [P-Schedule I]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [02-Chapter 13 - Pre-Confirmation Plan Amendment]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [0-Change of Address (document requesting)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:December 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Ch. 13 Trustee Motion Objecting to Discharge]
    Date Published:December 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:December 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [04-Payment of FINAL Installment Re: Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Filing Fee]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [03-Payment of Chapter 13 Installment Fee]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:November 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Granting Application to Pay Filing Fees]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [02g-Order Granting Application (Paid in Installments)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [02-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [02-Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [03-Motion to Avoid Lien with Notice to Respond]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?999444
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =