open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:13-60203-bem
    Party Name:Christopher Paul Triplett, Sr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Discharged]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Order Closing 7 No Asset Case]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [05-Trustees Interim Report]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Dismiss for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Motion to]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?963636
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =