open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-55903-bem
    Party Name:Lawrence Rocky Mathis
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Discharged]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order Closing 13 Discharged]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Trustee's (12/13) Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Discharging Debtor.]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Discharge of Ch. 13 Debtor]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Debtor's 11 U.S.C. Section 1328 Certificate]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Plan Completion Re: 522(q) May NOT Apply]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:October 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Retired Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:October 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Case Reassignment]
    Date Published:March 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:August 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:August 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Transfer of Claim (FEE)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [03-Motion to Avoid Lien with Notice to Respond]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?996269
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =