open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:18-11482-
    Party Name:Cassandra Catria Smith
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Release of Wages]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Dismissing Case (Trustee's Motion to Dismiss)]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Relief from Stay (Order)]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Garnishment Order]
    Date Published:October 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Amended Salary Order]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?280274
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =