open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-30141-
    Party Name:Patricia Lattimore
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:October 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Continuing Hearing to:]
    Date Published:August 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Confirming Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Increase Payments or Dismiss (order)]
    Date Published:January 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Consent Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Amended Order]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?286728
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =