open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-40166-
    Party Name:Robert G. Fuller, Jr. and Janell M. Fuller
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Release of Wages (trustee generated)]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Relief from Stay (Order)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Referring Matter]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Continuing Hearing to:]
    Date Published:May 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Confirming Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Disallowing Claim(s)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?284890
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =