open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:16-20902-
    Party Name:Linda Emily Gibson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Release of Wages (trustee generated)]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Settlement (order)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Striking Pleading]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Pay Filing Fees]
    Date Published:May 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Employ (order)]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Extend Automatic Stay (order)]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Extend Time to Pay Filing Fees (order)]
    Date Published:November 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:November 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Release of Wages]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Dismissing Case (Ch 13 Debtor's Request)]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?282809
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =