open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:16-20701-
    Party Name:Lisa A. Hobby
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Consent Order]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Confirming Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Extend Time to Pay Filing Fees (order)]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Extend Automatic Stay (order)]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Release of Wages]
    Date Published:August 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Dismissing Case (Ch 13 Debtor's Request)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Granting Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Release of Wages (trustee generated)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Relief from Stay (Order)]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:April 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Amended Salary Order]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?265826
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =