open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-20984-
    Party Name:Albert E Warren, Jr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Souther,, Trustee R. Michael [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Souther,, Trustee R. Michael [Converting Case 13 to 7]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Souther,, Trustee R. Michael [Release of Wages]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Increase Payments or Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Release of Wages (trustee generated)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:October 24, 2014
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Amended Salary Order]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?269966
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =