open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-40654-
    Party Name:Julie M. Meyers
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Release of Wages (trustee generated)]
    Date Published:August 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Reconsider Dismissal of Case (order)]
    Date Published:May 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Dismissing Case (Trustee's Motion to Dismiss)]
    Date Published:February 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Motion to Make Direct Payments to Trustee]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?286723
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =