open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:15-40445-
    Party Name:Darleen Ruger
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Continuing Hearing to:]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Amended Order]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Reconsider Dismissal of Case (order)]
    Date Published:December 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Granting Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Consent Order]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Confirming Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Allow Claims]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Relief from Stay (Order)]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Motion to Make Direct Payments to Trustee]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?286737
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =