open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:13-50976-
    Party Name:Meisha N. Bailey
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Confirming Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Release of Wages (trustee generated)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Consent Order]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?284300
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =