open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:17-41741-
    Party Name:Shirley A. James
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Extend Automatic Stay (order)]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Motion to Make Direct Payments to Trustee (order)]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:November 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Dismissing Case (Trustee's Motion to Dismiss)]
    Date Published:October 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Relief from Stay (Order)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Sell (order)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Continuing Hearing to:]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Consent Order]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Motion to Make Direct Payments to Trustee]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?286721
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =