open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:15-50714-
    Party Name:Terry James Duncan
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Dismissing Case Before Confirmation with Prejudice]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Pay Filing Fees]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Pursuant to 11 USC 521(i)]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Motion to Make Direct Payments to Trustee]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Dismissing Case (Ch 13 Debtor's Request)]
    Date Published:September 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Release of Wages]
    Date Published:September 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Consent Order]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?283393
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =