open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-40260-
    Party Name:Julia B Wilson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:September 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Settlement (order)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Employ (order)]
    Date Published:April 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Granting Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:March 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Confirming Modified Chapter 13 Plan (Trustee filed MAC)]
    Date Published:November 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Relief from Stay (Order)]
    Date Published:November 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Continuing Hearing to:]
    Date Published:October 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay (order)]
    Date Published:September 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [on Confirmation]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?285218
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =