open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:18-50591-
    Party Name:Kelsey T. Everett
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Disallowing Claim(s)]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Confirming Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Release of Wages (trustee generated)]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Consent Order]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?284960
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =