open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:15-11999-
    Party Name:James Darell Neal and Misty Dawn Neal
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Release of Wages (trustee generated)]
    Date Published:May 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Consent Order]
    Date Published:August 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Allow Claims (order)]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Extend Time]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Sell]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?263255
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =