open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:17-60268-
    Party Name:Patrick T. Tillery
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Dismissing Case Before Confirmation]
    Date Published:November 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Pay Filing Fees]
    Date Published:October 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Extend Automatic Stay (order)]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Motion to Make Direct Payments to Trustee (order)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Dismissing Case (Ch 13 Debtor's Request)]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Consent Order]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Allowing Claim(s)]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Pursuant to 11 USC 521(i)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Motion to Make Direct Payments to Trustee]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [on Confirmation]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?285614
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =