open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-10446-
    Party Name:James S Mills and Nancy B Mills
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Redact (order)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Dismissing Case (Trustee's Motion to Dismiss)]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Consent Order]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Granting Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [on Confirmation]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?285802
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =