open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:13-12344-
    Party Name:Brad C Jeffares
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Increase Payments or Dismiss (order)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Allow Claims (order)]
    Date Published:March 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Substitute Attorney (order)]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Le, Huon [Motion for Leave to Sell Real Estate (Ch 13)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?283999
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =