open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-40462
    Party Name:David Franklin Simpson and Roxanna Marie Simpson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Notice of Certification of Plan Completion and Request for Discharge]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Notice to Debtor Regarding Certification of Plan Completion (1st NOTICE)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?342489
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =