open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-10626
    Party Name:Denise Davis
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:October 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:August 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Notice of Certification of Plan Completion and Request for Discharge]
    Date Published:July 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Notice to File Form 423 - Supplemental Notice Ch 13 Only]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Notice to Debtor Regarding Certification of Plan Completion (1st NOTICE)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Modify Plan After Confirmation]
    Date Published:July 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?342478
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =